VA HJR610 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-24 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-24 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Secretary of Natural Resources; the effects of wind tide flooding in the Southern Watershed; report. Requests the Secretary of Natural Resources to study the effects of wind tide flooding in the Southern Watershed. In conducting the study, the Secretary shall (i) coordinate with and provide resources to the City of Virginia Beach to assess the impacts of wind tide flooding in the Southern Watershed, (ii) research the viability of a range of solutions aimed at addressing the root causes and effects of wind tide flooding in the Southern Watershed, (iii) identify the time frames and economic costs of various solutions, and (iv) make recommendations for state action based on all relevant factors.
Title
Wind tide flooding in the Southern Watershed; Secretary of Natural Resources to study the effects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 98-N 1-A) (Y: 1 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 98-N 1-A) (Y: 1 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-24 | House | Failed to pass in House |
2019-02-24 | House | No further action taken |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senators: Stuart, Wagner, Spruill |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2019-02-21 | House | Delegates: Knight, Marshall, Keam |
2019-02-21 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2019-02-21 | House | House acceded to request |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 98-N 1-A) |
2019-02-21 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (1-Y 98-N 1-A) |
2019-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate with amendment by voice vote |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment by voice vote |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reading waived |
2019-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House |
2019-02-04 | House | Taken up |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-12-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-12-26 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101462D |