VA HJR609 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Study, JLARC; health care spending; report. Directs the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to study health care spending in the Commonwealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care spending in the Commonwealth; JLARC to study.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Rules
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17HouseAssigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-12-21HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2018-12-21HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103647D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback