VA HJR605 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HJR605
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Victims of COVID-19 Remembrance Day. Designating March 14, in 2021 and in each succeeding year, as Victims of COVID-19 Remembrance Day in Virginia.
Title
Victims of COVID-19 Remembrance Day; designating as March 14, 2021 & each succeeding yr. thereafter.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ605ER) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reading waived |
2021-01-26 | House | VOTE: Agree To (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Engrossed by House |
2021-01-26 | House | Taken up |
2021-01-22 | House | Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-01-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 21102353D |
Same As/Similar To
HJR605 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)