VA HJR604 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HJR604
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission; confirming appointment. Confirms the appointment of Hal E. Greer as the Director of the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission. Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission; confirming appointment. Confirms the appointment of Hal E. Greer as the Director of the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission.
Title
General Assembly; confirming appointment to Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendment(s) (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendment(s) (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reading waived |
2021-01-26 | House | VOTE: Agree To (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Printed as engrossed 21103282D-E |
2021-01-26 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HJ604E |
2021-01-26 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-01-26 | House | Taken up |
2021-01-22 | House | Reported from Rules with amendment(s) (18-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-01-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 21103282D |
Same As/Similar To
HJR604 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)