VA HJR604 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-17 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ604ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Celebrating the life of the Honorable Joseph William O'Brien, Jr.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Celebrating the life of the Honorable Joseph William O'Brien, Jr.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-17HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HJ604ER)
2013-01-17SenateAgreed to by Senate
2013-01-14SenateLaid on Clerk's Desk
2013-01-14SenateReceived
2013-01-11HouseAgreed to by House
2013-01-11HouseEngrossed by House
2013-01-09HouseIntroduced bill reprinted 13102707D
2013-01-05HousePrefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/09/13 13102707D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback