VA HJR604 | 2008 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-08 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ604ER)

Summary

Celebrating the life of Sergeant Forrest Dane Cauthorn.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Celebrating the life of Sergeant Forrest Dane Cauthorn.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2008-03-08 House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ604ER)
2008-03-06 Senate: Agreed to by Senate
2008-03-06 Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk
2008-03-06 Senate: Received
2008-03-06 House: Introduced bill reprinted 089155780
2008-03-05 House: Communicated to Senate
2008-03-05 House: Agreed to by House
2008-03-05 House: Engrossed by House
2008-03-03 House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 089155780

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback