VA HJR601 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-28 - Agreed to by Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Celebrating the life of Marvin Howard Wagner.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Celebrating the life of Marvin Howard Wagner.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-28SenateAgreed to by Senate
2021-01-26SenateLaid on Clerk's Desk
2021-01-26SenateReceived
2021-01-25HouseAgreed to by House
2021-01-25HouseEngrossed by House
2021-01-20HousePresented and laid on Speaker's table 21100205D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback