VA HJR6 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0812)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0812)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (second resolution); real property tax; exemption for surviving spouse of a disabled veteran. Provides that the real property tax exemption for the principal residence of the surviving spouse of a disabled military veteran applies without any restriction on the surviving spouse's moving to a different principal place of residence.
Title
Constitutional amendment; real property tax exemption for spouse of disabled veteran.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0812) | |
2018-04-09 | House | Assigned Chapter 812 (effective 7/1/18) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ6ER) |
2018-03-20 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Reading waived |
2018-02-08 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | House | Agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | House | Engrossed by House |
2018-02-08 | House | Taken up |
2018-02-07 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-06 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-02 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-22 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2017-12-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-12-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100166D |