VA HJR593 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-8)
Status: Passed on February 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ593ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Remembering the 80th anniversary of Kristallnacht. Remembering the 80th anniversary of Kristallnacht.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Remembering the 80th anniversary of Kristallnacht.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HJ593ER)
2019-02-21HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-20SenateAgreed to by Senate with amendments by voice vote
2019-02-20SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-20SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-20SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-02-20SenateRead third time
2019-02-19SenateReading waived (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateReported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2019-02-05SenateReading waived
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseAgreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House
2019-02-04HouseTaken up
2019-01-31HouseReported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17HouseAssigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-11-30HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2018-11-30HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100989D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback