VA HJR583 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-09 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ583ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Celebrating the life of Joseph Edward Carey, Sr.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Celebrating the life of Joseph Edward Carey, Sr.

Sponsors

Del. Otto Wachsmann [R]Del. James Edmunds [R]Del. Thomas Wright [R]Del. Dawn Adams [D]
Del. Les Adams [R]Del. Timothy Anderson [R]Del. Terry Austin [R]Del. John Avoli [R]
Sen. Lamont Bagby [D]Del. Jason Ballard [R]Del. Amanda Batten [R]Del. Robert Bell [R]
Del. Elizabeth Bennett-Parker [D]Del. Robert Bloxom [R]Del. Jeffrey Bourne [D]Sen. Emily Brewer [R]
Del. David Bulova [D]Del. Kathy Byron [R]Del. Ellen Campbell [R]Del. Jeffrey Campbell [R]
Del. Betsy Carr [D]Del. Mike Cherry [R]Del. Nadarius Clark [D]Del. Kelly Convirs-Fowler [D]
Del. AC Cordoza [R]Del. Carrie Coyner [R]Del. Glenn Davis [R]Del. Karrie Delaney [D]
Sen. Tara Durant [R]Del. Matt Fariss [R]Del. Eileen Filler-Corn [D]Del. Hyland Fowler [R]
Del. Nicholas Freitas [R]Del. Todd Gilbert [R]Del. Jackie Glass [D]Del. Wendy Gooditis [D]
Del. Karen Greenhalgh [R]Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D]Del. C.E. Hayes [D]Sen. Chris Head [R]
Del. Dan Helmer [D]Del. Charniele Herring [D]Del. Keith Hodges [R]Del. Patrick Hope [D]
Del. Sally Hudson [D]Del. Clinton Jenkins [D]Del. Terry Kilgore [R]Del. Barry Knight [R]
Del. Kaye Kory [D]Del. Paul Krizek [D]Del. Dave LaRock [R]Del. James Leftwich [R]
Del. Alfonso Lopez [D]Del. Michelle Maldonado [D]Del. Marie March [R]Del. Daniel Marshall [R]
Sen. John McGuire [R]Del. Joseph McNamara [R]Del. Delores McQuinn [D]Del. James Morefield [R]
Del. Michael Mullin [D]Del. Kathleen Murphy [D]Del. Israel O'Quinn [R]Del. Robert Orrock [R]
Del. Kenneth Plum [D]Del. Margaret Ransone [R]Del. Sam Rasoul [D]Del. David Reid [D]
Del. Roxann Robinson [R]Sen. Danica Roem [D]Del. Chris Runion [R]Del. Don Scott [D]
Del. Phillip Scott [R]Del. Holly Seibold [D]Del. Briana Sewell [D]Del. Irene Shin [D]
Del. Mark Sickles [D]Del. Marcus Simon [D]Del. Shelly Simonds [D]Sen. Suhas Subramanyam [D]
Del. Richard Sullivan [D]Del. Anne Ferrell Tata [R]Del. Kim Taylor [R]Del. Luke Torian [D]
Del. Kathy Tran [D]Sen. Schuyler VanValkenburg [D]Del. Wendell Walker [R]Del. William Wampler [R]
Del. Jeion Ward [D]Del. Lee Ware [R]Del. Vivian Watts [D]Del. Michael Webert [R]
Del. Bill Wiley [R]Del. Rodney Willett [D]Del. Wren Williams [R]Sen. Angelia Williams Graves [D]
Del. Tony Wilt [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-09HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HJ583ER)
2023-02-09SenateAgreed to by Senate
2023-02-07SenateLaid on Clerk's Desk
2023-02-07SenateReceived
2023-02-06HouseAgreed to by House
2023-02-06HouseEngrossed by House
2023-01-30HousePassed by for the day
2023-01-23HousePresented and laid on Speaker's table 23103606D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback