VA HJR582 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HJR582
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0517)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0517)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (first reference); marriage; repeal of same-sex marriage prohibition; affirmative right to marry. Repeals the constitutional provision defining marriage as only a union between one man and one woman as well as the related provisions that are no longer valid as a result of the United States Supreme Court decision in Obergefell v. Hodges, 576 U.S. 644 (2015). The amendment provides that the right to marry is a fundamental right inherent in the liberty of persons and requires the Commonwealth and its political subdivisions and agents to issue marriage licenses, recognize marriages, and treat all marriages equally under the law, regardless of the sex or gender of the parties to the marriage. Religious organizations and clergy acting in their religious capacity have the right to refuse to perform any marriage.
Title
Constitutional amendment; fundamental right to marry, removes same-sex marriage prohibition.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Sickles [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Del. Marcia Price [D] | Sen. Danica Roem [D] | Sen. Suhas Subramanyam [D] | Del. Kathy Tran [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (22-Y 12-N) (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (60-Y 33-N) (Y: 60 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (60-Y 33-N) (Y: 60 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0517) | |
2021-03-31 | House | Assigned Chapter 517 (effective 7/1/21) |
2021-03-09 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ582ER) |
2021-03-09 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate (22-Y 12-N) |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 4-N 1-A) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Reading waived |
2021-02-04 | House | VOTE: Agree To (60-Y 33-N) |
2021-02-04 | House | Agreed to by House (60-Y 33-N) |
2021-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HJ582H1 |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21104282D-H1 |
2021-02-04 | House | Taken up |
2021-02-03 | House | Incorporates HJ557 (Lopez) |
2021-02-03 | House | Incorporates HJ539 (Levine) |
2021-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 21104282D-H1 |
2021-02-03 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 8-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-20 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Constitutional Amendments |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2021-01-13 | House | Presented and ordered printed 21102567D |
Same As/Similar To
HJ539 (Similar To)
HJ557 (Similar To)
HJ539 (Similar To)
HJ557 (Similar To)
HJR582 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
HJ557 (Similar To)
HJ539 (Similar To)
HJ557 (Similar To)
HJR582 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)