VA HJR582 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Constitutional amendment (first reference); marriage; repeal of same-sex marriage prohibition; affirmative right to marry. Repeals the constitutional provision defining marriage as only a union between one man and one woman as well as the related provisions that are no longer valid as a result of the United States Supreme Court decision in Obergefell v. Hodges, 576 U.S. 644 (2015). The amendment provides that the right to marry is a fundamental right inherent in the liberty of persons and requires the Commonwealth and its political subdivisions and agents to issue marriage licenses, recognize marriages, and treat all marriages equally under the law, regardless of the sex or gender of the parties to the marriage. Religious organizations and clergy acting in their religious capacity have the right to refuse to perform any marriage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional amendment; fundamental right to marry, removes same-sex marriage prohibition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (60-Y 33-N) (Y: 60 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-02-05SenateReading waived
2021-02-04HouseVOTE: Agree To (60-Y 33-N)
2021-02-04HouseAgreed to by House (60-Y 33-N)
2021-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HJ582H1
2021-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21104282D-H1
2021-02-04HouseTaken up
2021-02-03HouseIncorporates HJ557 (Lopez)
2021-02-03HouseIncorporates HJ539 (Levine)
2021-02-03HouseCommittee substitute printed 21104282D-H1
2021-02-03HouseReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (14-Y 8-N)
2021-02-01HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N)
2021-01-20HouseAssigned P & E sub: Constitutional Amendments
2021-01-13HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-01-13HousePresented and ordered printed 21102567D

Same As/Similar To

HJ539 (Similar To) 2021-02-03 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
HJ557 (Similar To) 2021-02-03 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
HJ539 (Similar To) 2021-02-03 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections
HJ557 (Similar To) 2021-02-03 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback