VA HJR581 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on February 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ581ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Study; Interstate 95 Corridor Improvement Plan; report. Requests the Commonwealth Transportation Board to study the portion of the Interstate 95 corridor between Exit 118 and the Springfield Interchange, financing options for improvements to the corridor, and the effect that enhanced transit service would have on mitigating traffic along the corridor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interstate 95 Corridor Improvement Plan; Commonwealth Transportation Board to study.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator reconsidered (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 7-N) (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator Peake rejected 19107425D-S1 (10-Y 29-N) (Y: 10 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Amendment #2 by Senator Surovell reconsidered (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator Peake agreed to 19107425D-S1 (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HJ581ER)
2019-02-21HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 7-N)
2019-02-21HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (90-Y 7-N)
2019-02-21SenateAgreed to by Senate with amendment by voice vote
2019-02-21SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-21SenateAmendment #1 by Senator Surovell agreed to
2019-02-21SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-21SenateSubstitute by Senator Peake rejected 19107425D-S1 (10-Y 29-N)
2019-02-21SenateSubstitute by Senator Peake reconsidered (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21SenateAmendment #2 by Senator Surovell rejected
2019-02-21SenateAmendment #2 by Senator Surovell reconsidered (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21SenateAmendment #2 by Senator Surovell agreed to
2019-02-21SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-21SenateAmendment #1 by Senator Surovell withdrawn
2019-02-21SenateSubstitute by Senator Peake agreed to 19107425D-S1 (22-Y 18-N)
2019-02-21SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-21SenateRead third time
2019-02-21SenateFloor substitute printed 19107425D-S1 (Peake)
2019-02-20SenatePassed by for the day
2019-02-19SenateReading waived (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateReported from Rules by voice vote
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2019-02-05SenateReading waived
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseAgreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House
2019-02-04HouseTaken up
2019-01-31HouseReported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N)
2019-01-17HouseAssigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-08-14HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2018-08-14HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100237D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HJ581
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HJ581+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HJ581S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HJ581ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H2001V0029+HJ0581
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H20V0029+HJ0581
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2268+HJ0581
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0833HJ0581+HJ0581
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0974HJ0581+HJ0581
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0975HJ0581+HJ0581
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0977HJ0581+HJ0581
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3260+HJ0581
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0976HJ0581+HJ0581

Bill Comments

feedback