VA HJR580 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-02 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ580ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commending Heather Harper Gunn.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending Heather Harper Gunn.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-02HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HJ580ER)
2023-02-02SenateAgreed to by Senate by voice vote
2023-01-31SenateLaid on Clerk's Desk
2023-01-31SenateReceived
2023-01-30HouseAgreed to by House by voice vote
2023-01-30HouseEngrossed by House
2023-01-23HousePresented and laid on Speaker's table 23103687D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback