VA HJR572 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HJR572
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-19 - Passed by indefinitely in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-19 - Passed by indefinitely in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognition of the Wolf Creek Cherokee Tribe of Virginia. Extends state recognition to the Wolf Creek Cherokee Tribe of Virginia within the Commonwealth.
Title
Wolf Creek Cherokee Tribe of Virginia; General Assembly to extend state recognition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-19 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Rules by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reading waived |
2021-01-26 | House | VOTE: Agree To (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Engrossed by House |
2021-01-26 | House | Taken up |
2021-01-22 | House | Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102445D |
Same As/Similar To
HJR572 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)