VA HJR571 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-21 - Agreed to by Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-21 - Agreed to by Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Alan Zimm.
Title
Celebrating the life of Alan Zimm.
Sponsors
Sen. Schuyler VanValkenburg [D] | Del. Rodney Willett [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] |
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Delores McQuinn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-21 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Received |
2021-01-18 | House | Agreed to by House |
2021-01-18 | House | Engrossed by House |
2021-01-13 | House | Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/13/21 21100565D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HJ571 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HJ571+hil |