VA HJR571 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on January 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-30 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ571ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commending the Fairfax County Fill the Boot Campaign.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending the Fairfax County Fill the Boot Campaign.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-01-30HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HJ571ER)
2015-01-29SenateAgreed to by Senate by voice vote
2015-01-26SenateLaid on Clerk's Desk
2015-01-26SenateReceived
2015-01-23HouseAgreed to by House by voice vote
2015-01-23HouseEngrossed by House
2015-01-16HousePassed by for the day
2015-01-08HousePrefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/14/15 15100851D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback