VA HJR571 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-08 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ571ER)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-08 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ571ER)
Summary
Commending Mosby Memorial Baptist Church on the occasion of its 100th anniversary.
Title
Commending Mosby Memorial Baptist Church on the occasion of its 100th anniversary
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-08 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ571ER) | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Received | |
2008-03-05 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-03-05 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2008-03-05 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2008-03-05 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 089319580 | |
2008-03-03 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 089319580 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HJ571 |