VA HJR567 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HJR567
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ567ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ567ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; JLARC; increasing the progressivity of Virginia's individual income tax system; report. Directs the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to study increasing the progressivity of Virginia's individual income tax system to make it more progressive and fair in response to economic dynamics. Study; JLARC; increasing the progressivity of Virginia's individual income tax system; report. Directs the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to study increasing the progressivity of Virginia's individual income tax system to make it more progressive and fair in response to economic dynamics.
Title
Income tax, state; JLARC to study increasing the progressivity of Virginia's system.
Sponsors
Del. Vivian Watts [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (55-Y 40-N) (Y: 55 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendment(s) (13-Y 5-N) (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 2-N) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (55-Y 40-N) (Y: 55 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendment(s) (13-Y 5-N) (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 2-N) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ567ER) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reading waived |
2021-01-26 | House | VOTE: Agree To (55-Y 40-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Agreed to by House (55-Y 40-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Printed as engrossed 21102685D-E |
2021-01-26 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HJ567E |
2021-01-26 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-01-26 | House | Taken up |
2021-01-22 | House | Reported from Rules with amendment(s) (13-Y 5-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-20 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102685D |
Same As/Similar To
HJR567 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
Subjects
Income Tax
Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission (JLARC)
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Taxation
Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission (JLARC)
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Taxation