VA HJR565 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-21 - Agreed to by Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Celebrating the life of the Honorable Augustus Benton Chafin, Jr.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Celebrating the life of the Honorable Augustus Benton Chafin, Jr.

Sponsors

Del. Terry Kilgore [R]Del. James Leftwich [R]Del. Les Adams [R]Del. Lashrecse Aird [D]
Del. Terry Austin [R]Del. John Avoli [R]Del. Hala Ayala [D]Del. Amanda Batten [R]
Del. Robert Bell [R]Del. Robert Bloxom [R]Del. Jeffrey Bourne [D]Del. Emily Brewer [R]
Del. David Bulova [D]Del. Kathy Byron [R]Del. Jeffrey Campbell [R]Del. Ronnie Campbell [R]
Del. Betsy Carr [D]Del. Joshua Cole [D]Del. Mark Cole [R]Del. Kelly Convirs-Fowler [D]
Del. Kirkland Cox [R]Del. Carrie Coyner [R]Del. Glenn Davis [R]Del. Karrie Delaney [D]
Del. James Edmunds [R]Del. Matt Fariss [R]Del. Eileen Filler-Corn [D]Del. Hyland Fowler [R]
Del. Nicholas Freitas [R]Del. Todd Gilbert [R]Del. Wendy Gooditis [D]Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D]
Del. C.E. Hayes [D]Del. Chris Head [R]Del. Dan Helmer [D]Del. Steve Heretick [D]
Del. Charniele Herring [D]Del. Keith Hodges [R]Del. Patrick Hope [D]Del. Sally Hudson [D]
Del. Chris Hurst [D]Del. Jerrauld Jones [D]Del. Mark Keam [D]Del. Barry Knight [R]
Del. Paul Krizek [D]Del. Dave LaRock [R]Del. Mark Levine [D]Del. Alfonso Lopez [D]
Del. Daniel Marshall [R]Del. John McGuire [R]Del. Joseph McNamara [R]Del. Delores McQuinn [D]
Del. Jason Miyares [R]Del. James Morefield [R]Del. Martha Mugler [D]Del. Michael Mullin [D]
Del. Candi Mundon King [D]Del. Kathleen Murphy [D]Del. Israel O'Quinn [R]Del. Robert Orrock [R]
Del. Kenneth Plum [D]Del. Charles Poindexter [R]Del. Marcia Price [D]Del. Margaret Ransone [R]
Del. Sam Rasoul [D]Del. David Reid [D]Del. Roxann Robinson [R]Del. Danica Roem [D]
Del. Chris Runion [R]Del. Larry Rush [R]Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D]Del. Don Scott [D]
Del. Mark Sickles [D]Del. Marcus Simon [D]Del. Shelly Simonds [D]Del. Suhas Subramanyam [D]
Del. Richard Sullivan [D]Del. Luke Torian [D]Del. Kathy Tran [D]Del. Roslyn Tyler [D]
Del. Schuyler VanValkenburg [D]Del. Wendell Walker [R]Del. William Wampler [R]Del. Lee Ware [R]
Del. Vivian Watts [D]Del. Michael Webert [R]Del. Bill Wiley [R]Del. Rodney Willett [D]
Del. Tony Wilt [R]Del. Thomas Wright [R]Del. Scott Wyatt [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-21SenateAgreed to by Senate
2021-01-19SenateLaid on Clerk's Desk
2021-01-19SenateReceived
2021-01-18HouseAgreed to by House
2021-01-18HouseEngrossed by House
2021-01-13HousePrefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/13/21 21102853D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback