VA HJR565 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Introduced on December 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-04 - VOTE: REJECTED (46-Y 49-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-04 - VOTE: REJECTED (46-Y 49-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
United States Constitution; amendment. Makes application to the United States Congress to call an amendment convention for the purpose of proposing a constitutional amendment that requires a balanced federal budget.
Title
U.S. Constitution; application to Congress of United States to call an amendment convention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (46-Y 49-N) (Y: 47 N: 50 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-04 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (46-Y 49-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Rejected by House (46-Y 49-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13104867D-H1 |
2013-02-04 | House | Taken up |
2013-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104867D-H1 |
2013-01-31 | House | Reported from Rules with substitute (12-Y 3-N) |
2013-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-01-11 | House | Referred from Privileges and Elections by voice vote |
2012-12-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2012-12-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102995D |