VA HJR563 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HJR563
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Work group; feasibility of transitioning to a unitary combined reporting system for corporate income tax purposes. Directs the Division of Legislative Services, in conjunction with the Department of Taxation, to establish a work group to assess the feasibility of transitioning to a unitary combined reporting system for corporate income tax purposes. Work group; feasibility of transitioning to a unitary combined reporting system for corporate income tax purposes. Directs the Division of Legislative Services, in conjunction with the Department of Taxation, to establish a work group to assess the feasibility of transitioning to a unitary combined reporting system for corporate income tax purposes.
Title
Corporate tax; DLS to establish group to assess transitioning to unitary combined reporting system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (73-Y 21-N) (Y: 73 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Finance (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (73-Y 21-N) (Y: 73 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Finance (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ563ER) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Reading waived |
2021-01-29 | House | VOTE: Agree To (73-Y 21-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Agreed to by House (73-Y 21-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House |
2021-01-29 | House | Taken up |
2021-01-27 | House | Reported from Finance (18-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred from Rules by voice vote |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102702D |
Same As/Similar To
HJR563 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
Subjects
Corporations
Income Tax
Legislative Services Division of
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Taxation
Income Tax
Legislative Services Division of
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Taxation