VA HJR563 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Study; Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to update its 2004 study of replacing individual income tax revenues with sales and use tax revenues; report. Directs JLARC to update its 2004 study of replacing individual income tax revenues with sales and use tax revenues. The resolution requires JLARC to develop recommendations for replacing the individual income tax based upon the elimination of exemptions from the state and local retail sales and use tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Individual income tax revenues; JLARC to update its 2004 study.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-10HouseLeft in Rules
2015-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
2015-01-20HouseAssigned Rules sub: Studies
2015-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2015-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100325D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback