VA HJR563 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-21 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ563ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commending Mount Pleasant Baptist Church on the occasion of its 144th anniversary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending Mount Pleasant Baptist Church on the occasion of its 144th anniversary.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-01-21 House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ563ER)
2011-01-20 Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
2011-01-17 Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk
2011-01-17 Senate: Received
2011-01-14 House: Agreed to by House by voice vote
2011-01-14 House: Engrossed by House
2011-01-13 House: Introduced bill reprinted 11100372D
2011-01-05 House: Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/12/11 11100372D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback