VA HJR562 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0770)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0770)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (first resolution); real property tax; exemption for surviving spouse of a disabled veteran. Provides that the real property tax exemption for the principal residence of the surviving spouse of a disabled military veteran applies without any restriction on the spouse's moving to a different principal place of residence.
Title
Constitutional amendment; real property tax exemption for spouse of disabled veteran.
Sponsors
Del. Jason Miyares [R] | Del. Kathy Byron [R] | Sen. John Bell [D] | Del. Glenn Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0770) | |
2017-03-27 | House | Assigned Chapter 770 (effective 7/1/17) |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ562ER) |
2017-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Reading waived |
2017-02-06 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Printed as engrossed 17102260D-E |
2017-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HJ562E |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-06 | House | Taken up |
2017-02-03 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-10 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Constitutional |
2016-12-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2016-12-23 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102260D |