VA HJR561 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on February 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ561ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Global Human Trafficking Awareness Day. Designates January 11, in 2011 and in each succeeding year, as Global Human Trafficking Awareness Day in Virginia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Global Human Trafficking Awareness Day; designating as January 11, 2011, and each succeeding year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-22 House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ561ER)
2011-02-22 Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
2011-02-22 Senate: Read third time
2011-02-21 Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
2011-02-18 Senate: Reported from Rules by voice vote
2011-02-14 Senate: Assigned Rules sub: #1
2011-01-24 Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules
2011-01-24 Senate: Reading waived
2011-01-21 House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
2011-01-21 House: Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N)
2011-01-21 House: Engrossed by House
2011-01-21 House: Taken up
2011-01-18 House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
2011-01-05 House: Referred to Committee on Rules
2011-01-05 House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100417D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback