VA HJR560 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-26 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ560ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Celebrating the life of Carlyle Conwell Ring, Jr.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Celebrating the life of Carlyle Conwell Ring, Jr.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-26HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HJ560ER)
2023-01-26SenateAgreed to by Senate
2023-01-24SenateLaid on Clerk's Desk
2023-01-24SenateReceived
2023-01-23HouseAgreed to by House
2023-01-23HouseEngrossed by House
2023-01-17HousePresented and laid on Speaker's table 23101360D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback