VA HJR552 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Study: joint subcommittee to study recurrent inland and urban flooding across the Commonwealth; report. Establishes a two-year joint subcommittee, consisting of eight legislative members and five nonlegislative citizen members, to study the development of a comprehensive and coordinated planning effort to address recurrent flooding in inland and urban areas across the Commonwealth. The joint subcommittee shall complete its work by November 30, 2022, and submit its findings and recommendations by the first day of the 2023 Session of the General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recurrent inland and urban flooding across the Commonwealth; joint subcommittee to study.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05HouseLeft in Rules
2021-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20HouseAssigned Rules sub: Studies
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102098D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback