VA HJR548 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ548ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ548ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending The College of William and Mary.
Title
Commending The College of William and Mary.
Sponsors
Del. Michael Mullin [D] | Del. Jeffrey Bourne [D] | Del. David Bulova [D] | Del. Steve Heretick [D] |
Del. Timothy Hugo [R] | Del. Jerrauld Jones [D] | Del. Jason Miyares [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ548ER) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received |
2018-03-07 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2018-03-07 | House | Engrossed by House |
2018-03-05 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 18107937D |