VA HJR545 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0769)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0769)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (first resolution); powers of General Assembly; suspension or nullification of administrative rule or regulation. Provides that the General Assembly may suspend or nullify any or all portions of any administrative rule or regulation by a joint resolution agreed to by a majority of the members elected to each house. The amendment also grants to the General Assembly the authority to authorize a legislative committee or legislative committees acting jointly or a legislative commission to suspend any or all portions of any administrative rule or regulation while the General Assembly is not in a regular session. Such suspension would continue until the end of the next regular session.
Title
Constitutional amendment; powers of General Assembly, etc.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Head [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (52-Y 46-N) (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (54-Y 40-N) (Y: 54 N: 40 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (54-Y 40-N) (Y: 54 N: 40 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0769) | |
2017-03-27 | House | Assigned Chapter 769 (effective 7/1/17) |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ545ER) |
2017-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-22 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (52-Y 46-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 17105335D-S1 (52-Y 46-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HJ545S1 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17105335D-S1 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17105335D-S1 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (8-Y 6-N) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Reading waived |
2017-02-06 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (54-Y 40-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Agreed to by House (54-Y 40-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Printed as engrossed 17100155D-E |
2017-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HJ545E |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-06 | House | Taken up |
2017-02-03 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (13-Y 8-N) |
2017-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 3-N) |
2017-01-10 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Constitutional |
2016-11-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2016-11-22 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100155D |