VA HJR543 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Department of Social Services; ways to increase participation in national service; report. Requests the Department of Social Services to study ways to increase participation in national service. In conducting its study, the Department of Social Services shall consider (i) promoting participation in national service via advertising of service opportunities through social media and traditional media outlets, (ii) identifying ways to increase funding for service opportunities, (iii) creating a Secretary of Service position within the Governor's Cabinet to advise the Governor and other members of his Cabinet on strategies to integrate national service opportunities into state initiatives and programming, (iv) strengthening hiring preferences in state government for individuals who have completed a year of service in a national service program, (v) offering retirement service credits for individuals who have completed a year of service in a national service program, (vi) providing in-state tuition for those serving in national service programs in the Commonwealth, and (vii) identifying other strategies for increasing participation in national service.
Title
National service; Department of Social Services to study ways to increase participation.
Sponsors
Del. Dan Helmer [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | House | Left in Rules |
2021-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2021-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102561D |