VA HJR542 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Study; Department of Rail and Public Transportation; transit equity and modernization; report. Requests the Department of Rail and Public Transportation to conduct a two-year study of transit equity and modernization in the Commonwealth,with emphasis on transit services and engagement opportunities for underserved and underrepresented communities. Study; Department of Rail and Public Transportation; transit equity and modernization; report. Requests the Department of Rail and Public Transportation to conduct a two-year study of transit equity and modernization in the Commonwealth,with emphasis on transit services and engagement opportunities for underserved and underrepresented communities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transit equity and modernization; Department of Rail and Public Transportation to study.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (77-Y 19-N) (Y: 77 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 1-N) (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2021-02-03SenateReading waived
2021-02-02HouseVOTE: Agree To (77-Y 19-N)
2021-02-02HouseAgreed to by House (77-Y 19-N)
2021-02-02HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HJ542H1
2021-02-02HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21104000D-H1
2021-02-02HouseTaken up
2021-01-29HouseCommittee substitute printed 21104000D-H1
2021-01-29HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22HouseAssigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety
2021-01-22HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-22HouseReported from Rules (17-Y 1-N)
2021-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20HouseAssigned Rules sub: Studies
2021-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2021-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102752D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HJ542
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HJ542+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HJ542H1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21104000D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/21104000.pdf
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H2001V0023+HJ0542
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H20V0035+HJ0542
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H0207V0013+HJ0542
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H02V0079+HJ0542
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1343+HJ0542
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S10V0041+HJ0542

Bill Comments

feedback