VA HJR541 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-2)
Status: Passed on January 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-27 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ541ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-2)
Status: Passed on January 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-27 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ541ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Dorothy Irene Height. Expresses the General Assembly's sorrow on the death of Dorothy Irene Height, native daughter and legendary civil rights leader.
Title
Celebrating the life of Dorothy Irene Height.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-27 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ541ER) | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Received | |
2011-01-21 | House: Agreed to by House | |
2011-01-21 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2011-01-14 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-01-13 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 11100066D | |
2010-12-10 | House: Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/12/11 11100066D |