VA HJR538 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Study; Virginia Community College System; feasibility of pursuing the approval of education preparation programs to be offered by comprehensive community colleges in the Commonwealth; report. Requests that the Virginia Community College System study the feasibility of pursuing the approval of education preparation programs to be offered by comprehensive community colleges in the Commonwealth and report its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly no later than November 30, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Comprehensive community colleges; VCC to study feasibility of approval of education prep. program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-07HouseLeft in Rules
2023-01-27HouseAssigned Rules sub: Studies
2023-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2023-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103030D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback