VA HJR530 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Study; Virginia State Crime Commission; alternative approaches to the Commonwealth's enforcement scheme for the possession of controlled substances, including decriminalization; report. Directs the Virginia State Crime Commission to study the propriety and effectiveness of alternative approaches to the Commonwealth's enforcement scheme for the possession of controlled substances, including decriminalization of the possession of such substances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled substances; VSCC to study decriminalization of possession, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05HouseLeft in Rules
2021-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20HouseAssigned Rules sub: Studies
2021-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2021-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102140D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback