VA HJR528 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; State Corporation Commission; Outage Data Initiative Nationwide; report. Requests the State Corporation Commission to convene a stakeholder workgroup and study the Commonwealth's participation in the Outage Data Initiative Nationwide.
Title
Outage Data Initiative Nationwide; SCC to study the Commonwealth's participation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Rules |
2023-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) |
2023-01-27 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103713D |