VA HJR527 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Study; Department of Conservation and Recreation and Virginia Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services; invasive plant species work group; report. Requests the Department of Conservation and Recreation, jointly with the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services, to establish a work group to study the sale and use of invasive plant species. The resolution requests that the departments work with several state agencies, conservation nonprofits, and plant industry and agriculture groups to develop recommendations regarding statutory and regulatory changes intended to reduce or eliminate the sale and use of invasive plant species in the Commonwealth and promote the sale and use of native plants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Invasive plant species; DCR, et al., to study the sale and use of species.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2021-01-27SenateReading waived
2021-01-26HouseVOTE: Agree To (98-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26HouseAgreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26HouseEngrossed by House
2021-01-26HouseTaken up
2021-01-22HouseReported from Rules (18-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20HouseAssigned Rules sub: Studies
2021-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2021-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102405D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback