VA HJR522 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Study; staffing levels, employment conditions, and compensation at the Virginia Department of Corrections; report. Continues the joint committee of the House Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions; the House Committee on Public Safety; the Senate Committee on the Judiciary; and the Senate Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services established by House Joint Resolution 29 (2020) to study staffing levels, employment conditions, and compensation at the Virginia Department of Corrections. The resolution directs the joint committee to conclude its work by November 30, 2021, and to report its findings and recommendations no later than the first day of the 2022 Regular Session of the General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Staffing levels, employment conditions, and compensation at DOC; continued study, appropriations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2021-02-01SenateReading waived
2021-01-29HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (95-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29HouseAgreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29HouseEngrossed by House
2021-01-29HouseTaken up
2021-01-27HouseReported from Appropriations (18-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22HouseAssigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government
2021-01-22HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-22HouseReported from Rules (18-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20HouseAssigned Rules sub: Studies
2020-12-29HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2020-12-29HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101691D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback