VA HJR52 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ52ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ52ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Secretary of Health and Human Resources; pharmaceutical Secretary of Health and Human Resources; pharmaceutical distribution payment system; report. Requests the Secretary of Health and Human Resources to convene a work group to examine the pharmaceutical distribution payment system in the Commonwealth and innovative solutions to address the cost of prescription drugs to Virginians at the point of sale.
Title
Prescription drugs; SHHR to convene work group to address cost to Virginians, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. Shelly Simonds [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. Clinton Jenkins [D] |
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] | Sen. Suhas Subramanyam [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ52ER) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading waived |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HJ52H1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107495D-H1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Taken up |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107495D-H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102591D |