VA HJR503 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-19 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ503ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-19 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ503ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of the Reverend Carl Douglas Farmer.
Title
Celebrating the life of the Reverend Carl Douglas Farmer.
Sponsors
Del. Nicholas Freitas [R] | Del. Kathy Byron [R] | Del. Mike Cherry [R] | Del. Phillip Scott [R] |
Del. Lee Ware [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ503ER) |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Received |
2023-01-16 | House | Agreed to by House |
2023-01-16 | House | Engrossed by House |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/11/23 23100829D |