VA HJR50 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ50ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Radiologic Technology Week. Designates the week of November 8, in 2020 and in each succeeding year, as Radiologic Technology Week in Virginia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Radiologic Technology Week.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-03HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HJ50ER)
2020-03-03SenateAgreed to by Senate by voice vote
2020-03-03SenateRead third time
2020-03-02SenateReading waived (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-28SenateReported from Rules by voice vote
2020-01-30SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2020-01-30SenateReading waived
2020-01-29HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (95-Y 0-N)
2020-01-29HouseAgreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
2020-01-29HouseEngrossed by House
2020-01-29HouseTaken up
2020-01-24HouseReported from Rules (18-Y 0-N)
2020-01-05HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2020-01-05HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100310D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback