VA HJR488 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Passed on February 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-14 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ488ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Passed on February 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-14 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ488ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Dyslexia Awareness Month. Designates October, in 2023 and in each succeeding year, as Dyslexia Awareness Month in Virginia.
Title
Dyslexia Awareness Month; designating as October 2023 and each succeeding year thereafter.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-14 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ488ER) |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Reading waived |
2023-02-03 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (97-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-03 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House |
2023-02-03 | House | Taken up |
2023-01-31 | House | Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2023-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100812D |