VA HJR462 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Left in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]


Commemorating the life and legacy of Mathias Wilberger.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Commemorating the life and legacy of Mathias Wilberger.



2018-03-10SenateLeft in Rules
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2018-03-08SenateReading waived
2018-03-07HouseAgreed to by House by voice vote
2018-03-07HouseEngrossed by House
2018-03-05HousePresented and laid on Speaker's table 18107930D

Virginia State Sources

Bill Comments