VA HJR446 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commending James Earp.
Title
Commending James Earp.
Sponsors
Del. Larry Rush [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Failed to pass in House |
2016-03-11 | House | No further action taken |
2016-03-09 | House | Passed by until Saturday, March 12, 2016 |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-03-04 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 16105965D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HJ446 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HJ446+hil |