VA HJR42 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on February 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-12 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ42ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on February 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-12 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ42ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Colonel Donald B. Kaiserman, USA, Ret.
Title
Commending Colonel Donald B. Kaiserman, USA, Ret.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-12 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ42ER) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Received |
2016-01-29 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2016-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House |
2016-01-15 | House | Passed by for the day |
2015-12-19 | House | Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/13/16 16100180D |