VA HJR391 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ391ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ391ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Patrick C. Kinlaw.
Title
Commending Patrick C. Kinlaw.
Sponsors
Sen. Schuyler VanValkenburg [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] | Del. Jeffrey Bourne [D] |
Del. Riley Ingram [R] | Sen. John McGuire [R] | Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Del. Debra Rodman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ391ER) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Received |
2018-02-28 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2018-02-28 | House | Engrossed by House |
2018-02-28 | House | Taken up for immediate consideration |
2018-02-27 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 18107312D |