VA HJR37 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-6)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ37ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-6)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ37ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the 50th anniversary of Green v. County School Board of New Kent County. The resolution is the recommendation of the Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr. Memorial Commission. The resolution incorporates HJ 137 and is identical to SJ 81.
Title
Commemorating the 50th anniversary of Green v. County School Board of New Kent County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION #2 (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION #2 (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ37ER) |
2018-03-06 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 18107858D-S1 (96-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2018-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate with substitute by voice vote |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HJ37S1 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18107858D-S1 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reading waived (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18107858D-S1 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reading waived |
2018-02-12 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION #2 (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2018-02-12 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Printed as engrossed 18101992D-E |
2018-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HJ37E |
2018-02-12 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-02-12 | House | Taken up |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported from Rules with amendments (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101992D |