VA HJR361 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ361ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ361ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Virginia members of Team USA at the 2015 Pan American Maccabi Games.
Title
Commending the Virginia members of Team USA at the 2015 Pan American Maccabi Games.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ361ER) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Received |
2016-03-04 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2016-03-04 | House | Engrossed by House |
2016-02-25 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 16105583D |