VA HJR326 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ326ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ326ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Honorable Samuel W. Swanson, Jr.
Title
Commending the Honorable Samuel W. Swanson, Jr.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ326ER) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Received |
2016-02-26 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2016-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House |
2016-02-18 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 16102662D |