VA HJR325 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Left in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Commemorating the life and legacy of Peter Francisco.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commemorating the life and legacy of Peter Francisco.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateLeft in Rules
2018-02-26SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2018-02-26SenateReading waived
2018-02-23HouseAgreed to by House by voice vote
2018-02-23HouseEngrossed by House
2018-02-21HousePresented and laid on Speaker's table 18107362D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback